FL S0544 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the selection and placement of barbering interns. Requires a school of barbering or a barbering program to provide written notice to the Barbers' Board regarding the internship sponsor and the barbering intern. Requires a barbering intern to possess written authorization to practice barbering. Requires the board to establish education prerequisites for barbering internships. Provides a limit on the registration fee for internship sponsors, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbering

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-09 Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 -SJ 185
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 48
2011-03-04 On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/09/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-02-09 Referred to Regulated Industries; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 48
2011-01-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0175 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
476034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476188Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476194Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback