FL H0175 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for selection & placement of barbering interns; requires school of barbering or barbering program to provide written notice to Barbers' Board regarding internship sponsor & barbering intern; provides requirements & duties of internship sponsor; requires barbershop to post notice regarding services of student intern; requires barbering intern to possess written authorization to practice barbering; requires board to establish education prerequisites for barbering internships, etc.
Title
Barbering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 21 | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 21 | |
2011-01-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0544 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
476 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/175 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0175/BillText/Filed/HTML |