FL S0536 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1087 (Ch. 2023-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1087 (Ch. 2023-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising requirements for the deferment of payment agreements for child support; revising the procedures for collection and distribution of court depository fees; removing exceptions to the prohibition on treating incarceration as voluntary employment; revising requirements for the Department of Revenue to commence proceedings regarding paternity and child support, etc.
Title
Child Support
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1087 (Ch. 2023-152) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Substituted HB 1087 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-08 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1087 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-152
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2563 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 1811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |