FL S0532 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Unfavorable by Rules, laid on Table; YEAS 3 NAYS 8 -SJ 309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Unfavorable by Rules, laid on Table; YEAS 3 NAYS 8 -SJ 309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the reclassification of criminal offenses committed under color of law.
Title
Public Corruption
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Unfavorable by Rules, laid on Table; YEAS 3 NAYS 8 -SJ 309 | |
2011-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/29/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 47 | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable by Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-28 | On Committee agenda-- Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections, 03/07/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections; Rules; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 47 | |
2011-01-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0249 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/532 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0532/BillText/Filed/HTML |