FL S0530 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00265; Substituted CS/HB 315 -SJ 00265; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 315 (Ch. 2010-6) -SJ 00265
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00265; Substituted CS/HB 315 -SJ 00265; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 315 (Ch. 2010-6) -SJ 00265
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an adoption agency or entity from making suitability determinations based on, requiring disclosure relating to, or restricting the lawful possession, storage, or use of a firearm or ammunition. Provides additional requirements for child-placing agencies. Provides additional rulemaking requirements for the DCFS. Creates additional grounds for denial, suspension, or revocation of a license.
Title
Adoption [SPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Sen. Paula Dockery [R] | Sen. Joe Negron [R] | Sen. Steve Oelrich [R] |
Sen. Durell Peaden [R] | Sen. John Thrasher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00265; Substituted CS/HB 315 -SJ 00265; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 315 (Ch. 2010-6) -SJ 00265 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00255 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable by- Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-08 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00190; On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/09/10, 3:30 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-04 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00190; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00236; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary -SJ 00043; On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 401-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary | |
2009-10-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0315 (Similar To) 2010-04-06 - Approved by Governor -HJ 00629; Chapter No. 2010-6
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0063 | 0422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |