FL S0520 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 793 (Ch. 2016-91)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 793 (Ch. 2016-91)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the initial award period and the renewal period for students who are unable to accept an initial award immediately after completion of high school due to a full-time religious or service obligation begin upon the completion of the religious or service obligation; requiring a student, as a prerequisite for the Florida Gold Seal Vocational Scholars award, to identify a civic issue or a professional area of interest and develop a plan for his or her personal involvement in addressing the issue or learning about the area, etc.
Title
Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Sen. Tom Lee [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Kelli Stargel [R] |
Sen. Bill Montford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 793 (Ch. 2016-91) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 793 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-14 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/14/16, 10:45 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 12/03/15, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Favorable by Higher Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 11/17/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0793 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-91
S0990 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 793 (Ch. 2016-91)
S0990 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 793 (Ch. 2016-91)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |