FL H0793 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that initial award period & renewal period for students who are unable to accept initial award immediately after high school due to specific obligations begins upon completion of obligation; requires student, as prerequisite for certain awards, to identify social or civic issue or professional area of interest & develop specified plan; creates Florida Gold Seal CAPE Scholars award; provides appropriation.
Title
Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program
Sponsors
House Education Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. Marlene O'Toole [R] | Rep. Janet Adkins [R] | Rep. Robert Cortes [R] |
Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#48 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#618 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#618 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Chapter No. 2016-91 | |
2016-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 520 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2016-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-24 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (500343) |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Education Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-09 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/09/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-14 | House | Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | Favorable by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2015-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0520 (Same As) 2016-03-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 793 (Ch. 2016-91)
S0990 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 793 (Ch. 2016-91)
S0990 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 793 (Ch. 2016-91)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |