FL S0512 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for participation in the state group health insurance program and the prescription drug coverage program to include all counties, municipalities, special taxing districts, and district school boards rather than only small counties and municipalities and certain school boards. Specifies prerequisites and conditions for participation. Provides a minimum period of enrollment, etc.
Title
Local Govt./Health Insurance/Drug Coverage [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-07 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by General Government Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-18 | Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/10, 8:00 am, 110-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00042; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 412-K; Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00163 | |
2010-02-17 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2010-02-16 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-02-04 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 412-K | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0929 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)