FL S0494 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2014-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2014-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating time limitations to the prosecution of specified criminal offenses relating to lewd or lascivious battery or molestation if the victim was younger than 16 years of age at the time of the offense, etc.
Title
Time Limitations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2014-4) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/18/14, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/13/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0445 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2014-4)
H7027 (Similar To) 2014-03-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2014-4)
S0526 (Similar To) 2014-04-02 - Chapter No. 2014-4
H7027 (Similar To) 2014-03-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2014-4)
S0526 (Similar To) 2014-04-02 - Chapter No. 2014-4