FL S0494 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2013-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2013-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to adopt a rule pertaining to the distribution of funds under the block grant program; requiring approved Section 108 loan applicants to enter into an agreement with the department; requiring that a local government's future community development block grant be reduced in the event of default; providing restrictions on the expenditure of block grant funds by local governments, etc.
Title
Community Development Block Grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2013-39) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7007 (Similar To) 2013-05-17 - Chapter No. 2013-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 406 (Ch. 2013-42)
S1024 (Similar To) 2013-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2013-39), CS/SB 406 (Ch. 2013-42)
S1024 (Similar To) 2013-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2013-39), CS/SB 406 (Ch. 2013-42)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
290 | 0411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 0475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/494 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0494/BillText/Filed/HTML |