FL S0490 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the responsibility for paying the expenses of medical care, treatment, hospitalization, and transportation for a person who is ill, wounded, or otherwise injured during or as a result of an arrest for a violation of a state law or a county or municipal ordinance is the responsibility of the person receiving the medical care, treatment, hospitalization, or transportation. Removes provisions establishing the order by which medical providers receive reimbursement for the expenses incurred in providing the medical services or transportation, etc.
Title
Medical Expense/Pretrial Detainee/Sentenced Inmate
Sponsors
Senate Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | Senate Health Regulation Committee | Sen. Dennis Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-03 | In Messages | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -SJ 745 | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Consent Calendar, 05/03/11 | |
2011-04-29 | Withdrawn from Budget with subcommittee recommendation -SJ 614 | |
2011-04-26 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 477 | |
2011-04-15 | Now in Budget -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-13 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-08 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 473 | |
2011-03-11 | Now in Budget -SJ 186 | |
2011-03-10 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-09 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 -SJ 186 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 44 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/09/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-02-22 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/21/11, 1:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Community Affairs; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 44 | |
2011-01-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0257 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
901 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |