FL H0257 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that responsibility for paying for medical care, treatment, hospitalization, & transportation for person who is ill, wounded, or otherwise injured during or as result of arrest for violation of state law or county or municipal ordinance is responsibility of person receiving care or services; requires each arrestee, pretrial detainee, or sentenced inmate who receives medical care or other services to cooperate in seeking reimbursement for such expenses of facility, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Expenses/Arrestee/Pretrial Detainee/Inmate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-11 Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 219
2011-03-10 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-09 CS/CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 211
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 27
2011-03-07 On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/09/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-02-28 Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee -HJ 149
2011-02-24 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-02-22 CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 151
2011-02-15 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/22/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-02-01 Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 28
2011-01-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0490 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
90135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
951032Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback