FL S0488 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Florida Building Commission to approve a specified evaluation entity, etc.
Title
Product Evaluation
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1577 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/488 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/488/BillText/Filed/HTML |