FL S0476 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating an exemption from public records for personal identifying information in compassionate and palliative care plans filed with the Clearinghouse for Compassionate and Palliative Care Plans managed by the Agency for Health Care Administration or its designee; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Compassionate and Palliative Care Plans/Agency for Health Care Administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-19SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-17SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S474 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
H1341 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H1339 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4080641Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback