FL S0470 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-18 - Now in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the grounds for issuance of a search warrant to include content held within a cellular phone, portable electronic communication device, or microphone-enabled household device when such content constitutes evidence relevant to proving that a felony has been committed; adopting the constitutional protection against unreasonable interception of private communications by any means for purposes of obtaining a search warrant; prohibiting the use of certain communication content in any trial, hearing or other proceeding which was obtained without a specified warrant, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Searches of Cellular Phones and Other Electronic Devices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-18SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-11-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-11-12SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2019-10-07SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
93302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93410Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93423Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93427Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93442Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback