FL H1457 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises exceptions to conduct that constitutes unlawful access to stored communications; authorizes investigative or law enforcement officer to apply for warrant, rather than order, authorizing real-time location tracking; authorizes extensions; provides for requiring completion of any installation authorized by warrant within certain timeframe; provides requirements for engaging in real-time location tracking; specifies when real-time location tracking must terminate; provides for acquisition of historical location data in certain circumstances.
Title
Searches of Cellular Phones and Other Electronic Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-03 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S470 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
934 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |