FL S0462 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 461
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that a woman who has recently given birth be excused from certain jury service under specified conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excusal from Jury Service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-14SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 461
2024-02-14SenateSubstituted CS/HB 461
2024-02-14SenateRead 2nd time
2024-02-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
2024-01-31SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-01-30SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2024-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-18SenateNow in Rules
2024-01-17SenateCS/CS by Health Policy read 1st time
2024-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-01-16SenateCS/CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2024-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-09SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-12-14SenateNow in Health Policy
2023-12-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-12-13SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-12-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/13/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-11-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Health Policy; Rules
2023-11-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H461 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-122

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Amendment/668184/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Analyses/2024s00462.pre.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Analyses/2024s00462.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Analyses/2024s00462.pre.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Analyses/2024s00462.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Analyses/2024s00462.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Analyses/2024s00462.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Vote/2023-12-13%200900AM~S00462%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Vote/2024-01-16%200130PM~S00462%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/462/Vote/2024-01-30%200330PM~S00462%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback