FL S0462 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2019-67)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a person who acquires for value a lien on property during the course of specified legal actions takes such lien free of claims in certain circumstances; specifying the effect of a valid, recorded notice of lis pendens in certain circumstances involving a judicial sale; revising requirements for substituted service on the spouse of the person to be served; exempting certified process servers from certain window sunscreening restrictions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial Process

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2019-67)
2019-04-03SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 91
2019-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-27SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-26SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-21SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/21/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-07SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-13SenateNow in Community Affairs
2019-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-11SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/19, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-01-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H91 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-67

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31629545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48194Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4823Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback