FL H0091 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that person who acquires for value lien on property during course of specified legal actions takes such lien free of claims in certain circumstances; specifies effect of valid, recorded lis pendens in certain circumstances; revises authority of special process servers; requires that civil witness subpoenas be served by certain persons; revises requirements for substituted service on spouse; revises requirements for documenting service; revises requirements for service on LLC's; revises provisions on service outside state; authorizes certain persons to electronically sign return-of-service; exempts certified process servers from certain window sunscreening restrictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial Process

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-67
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-04HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-03SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-03SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 462
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-04-02SenateReceived
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-03-27SenateIn Messages
2019-03-21HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-20HouseAmendment(s) adopted (431701)
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19
2019-03-11HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-03-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-08HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-07HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/07/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-15HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-02-15HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2019-02-15HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-12-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S462 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2019-67)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31629545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48194Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4823Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback