FL S0462 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts performance arts centers from obtaining approval from the Division of Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation of volunteer officers or directors of the performing arts center or of changes in such positions.
Title
Beverage Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 851 | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1118 | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1063 | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1009 | |
2011-04-06 | In Messages | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 362 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Consent Calendar, 04/06/11 | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 232 | |
2011-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/16/11, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-10 | Now in Rules -SJ 186 | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 186 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 42 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/09/11, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/22/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules -SJ 42 | |
2011-01-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0259 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 462 (Ch.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |