FL S0458 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the task force within the legislative branch; prescribing duties of the task force; specifying public records and public meetings requirements applicable to the task force, etc.
Title
Florida Criminal Justice Reform Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-11 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CS by Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/22/17, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0387 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S2502 (Similar To) 2017-06-05 - Chapter No. 2017-71, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 865 (Ch. 2017-42), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2502 (Similar To) 2017-06-05 - Chapter No. 2017-71, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 865 (Ch. 2017-42), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)