FL S0442 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Governors and State Board of Education, in consultation with the Department of Veterans' Affairs, to create a uniform system for the award of postsecondary credit to certain servicemembers and veterans of the United States Armed Forces; requiring specified postsecondary institutions to waive the transcript fee for active duty members of the Armed Forces of the United States, certain veterans, and their spouses and dependents, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Education for Certain Military Personnel
Sponsors
Senate Military and Veterans Affairs and Space Committee | Sen. Tom Lee [R] | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 03/26/19, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education; Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H217 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |