FL H0217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires BOG & SBE to create uniform system for award of postsecondary credit to certain servicemembers & veterans of United States Armed Forces; provides process for award of postsecondary credit for military experience & credentials; requires specified postsecondary institutions to waive transcript fee for active duty members of Armed Forces of United States, certain veterans, & their spouses & dependents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary Education for Certain Military Personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-15HouseCS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-14HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFavorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/04/19, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-15HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S442 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100926Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback