FL S0434 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "prescribed pediatric extended care center" or "PPEC center" to include certain buildings that provide certain residential services to infants with neonatal abstinence syndrome; providing that a specified Agency for Health Care Administration rule include an exception for infants being treated for neonatal abstinence syndrome; requiring the agency, in consultation with the Department of Children and Families, to establish a pilot project to approve one or more facilities licensed to provide PPEC services to treat certain eligible infants, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Neonatal Abstinence Syndrome Pilot Project

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-02HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-07SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-31SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 12/07/17, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2017-11-07SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-10-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H407 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099134Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback