FL S0434 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "prescribed pediatric extended care center" or "PPEC center" to include certain buildings that provide certain residential services to infants with neonatal abstinence syndrome; providing that a specified Agency for Health Care Administration rule include an exception for infants being treated for neonatal abstinence syndrome; requiring the agency, in consultation with the Department of Children and Families, to establish a pilot project to approve one or more facilities licensed to provide PPEC services to treat certain eligible infants, etc.
Title
Neonatal Abstinence Syndrome Pilot Project
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Dana Young [R] |
Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Messages |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2018-03-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2018-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 12/07/17, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-10-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H407 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 914 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9134 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |