FL S0416 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the POW-MIA Vietnam Veterans Bracelet Memorial; directing the Department of Management Services to designate space for the memorial's construction and placement by a specified date; requiring the department to consider recommendations of, and coordinate with, specified entities regarding the memorial's placement and design, etc.
Title
POW-MIA Vietnam Veterans Bracelet Memorial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#102 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-174 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-14 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 163 |
2021-04-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021) |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | In Messages |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/21 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/02/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H163 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 416 (Ch. 2021-174)