FL S0398 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a concealed weapon or firearm licensee from openly carrying a handgun or carrying a concealed weapon or firearm into any child care facility, etc.
Title
Concealed Weapons and Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H245 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/398 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/398/BillText/Filed/HTML |