FL S0398 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - CS adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - CS adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the relationship between and shared interests of the people of Taiwan and the United States and supporting these interests, as well as future opportunities for international trade between the two nations, etc.
Title
Taiwan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | CS adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8013 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Adopted by Publication