FL S0394 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising a principle of the Criminal Punishment Code relating to a prisoner's required minimum term of imprisonment; revising the incentive gain-time that the Department of Corrections may grant a prisoner, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gain-time

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-09-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H189 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S572 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
921002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback