FL S0572 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising a principle of the Criminal Punishment Code relating to a prisoner's required minimum term of imprisonment; revising the incentive gain-time that the Department of Corrections may grant a prisoner; authorizing the department to extend the limits of confinement to allow an inmate to participate in supervised community release, subject to certain requirements, as prescribed by the department by rule, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Release from Imprisonment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-12-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-10SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-10-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H189 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S394 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
946503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback