FL S0394 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a public employer from inquiring into or considering an applicant's criminal history on an initial employment application unless required to do so by law; prohibiting public postsecondary educational institutions from inquiring into or considering the criminal history of an applicant seeking admission, etc.
Title
Criminal History Records in Applications
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Education; Rules |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H667 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1007 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/394 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/394/BillText/Filed/HTML |