FL S0390 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying information of specific current and former personnel of the Department of Health and the spouses and children of such personnel, under specified circumstances; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Identifying Information of Personnel of Department of Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#795 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-72 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 419 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Received |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-23 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/14 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/26/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/13/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0419 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 390 (Ch. 2014-72)