FL S0386 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising a provision relating to the maximum delinquency charge that may be charged for consumer finance loans; revising a requirement relating to installment repayments for consumer finance loans, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Finance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#870 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-17
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-03-07HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 239
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseReceived
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-05HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-27HouseIn Messages
2018-02-27SenateCS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2018-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-07SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2017-12-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-10-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H239 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 386
S640 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H747 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
516031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51636Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback