FL H0747 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Access to Responsible Credit Pilot Program; specifies requirements for licensees, referral partners, & borrowers relating to consumer loans; requires examinations & reports; provides for disciplinary action; provides for future repeal of program.
Title
Consumer Finance Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall -- Workshopped |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S640 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H239 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 386
S386 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-17
H239 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 386
S386 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-17
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
516 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/747 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/747/BillText/Filed/PDF |