FL S0384 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Chapter No. 2023-190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Chapter No. 2023-190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the reclassification of specified offenses committed against criminal defense attorneys, etc.
Title
Violent Offenses Committed Against Criminal Defense Attorneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#116 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Chapter No. 2023-190 | |
2023-06-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-04-13 | House | CS passed; YEAS 109, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 71 |
2023-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2023) |
2023-04-12 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-04-12 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/23 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary |
2023-03-14 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H71 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 384 (Ch. 2023-190)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 0823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |