FL S0374 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Health and Human Services Contract Resource Council within the DMS. Establishes the duties of several state agencies, including the DJJ and the AHCA with regard to contracts for health and human services. Requires said council to designate a lead administrative coordinator for each contract service provider. Requires the council to make recommendations to the Legislature regarding legislation or rulemaking authority that would promote interdepartmental collaboration and program integration, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health and Human Services Contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-07 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-05 CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 461
2011-03-31 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/11, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 36
2011-01-19 References corrected to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget
2011-01-12 Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 36
2011-01-10 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0191 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870575Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback