FL H0191 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Health & Human Services Contract Resource Center to be administratively housed in DMS; provides duties; establishes board of trustees; provides for executive director; provides for implementation by specified date; exempts services provided by eligible lead community-based provider from being subject to state competitive bidding process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health and Human Services Contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 22
2011-01-25 Referred to HHS Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 22
2011-01-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0374 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4027305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4270135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627351Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback