FL S0362 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing within the agency a chief data officer position and the Geographic Information Office, etc.
Title
Agency for State Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 03/15/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/07/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |