FL S0356 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that such corporations include licensed mutual insurers as well as licensed stock insurers; providing that certain dividends or distributions by a not-for-profit insurance company to its mutual insurance holding company which meet certain requirements are permitted under provisions relating to stock and mutual insurers; amending definitions relating to mutual insurance holding companies to add provisions for not-for-profit insurance companies and nonprofit health care plans, etc.
Title
Mutual Insurance Corporations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#313 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Chapter No. 2013-125 | |
2013-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-29 | House | Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 509 |
2013-04-25 | House | Received |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13 |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (577342, 655700) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/13 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/01/13, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0509 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125)
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
617 | 01401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 727 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |