FL S0354 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the Seminole County Expressway Authority Law; creating the Seminole County Expressway Authority; prohibiting an entity or body or another authority from exercising jurisdiction, control, authority, or power over an expressway system in Seminole County without the consent of the Seminole County Expressway Authority; requiring notice of public hearing and an opportunity for municipal officials and residents to discuss and advise the authority; providing for the issuance of bonds; providing for lease-purchase agreements between the Department of Transportation and the authority; authorizing the Department of Transportation to use funds for the operation of the authority and to generate preparatory information necessary for an expressway system; authorizing the authority to acquire land and properties, etc.
Title
Seminole County Expressway Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2012-02-03 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2012-02-03 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 328 | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-31 | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 304 | |
2012-01-31 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-30 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/30/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-18 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-11 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 112 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 101 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 34 | |
2012-01-09 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-12-21 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/09/12, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-10-18 | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 34 | |
2011-09-28 | Filed |