FL S0348 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Florida Competitive Workforce Act"; adding sexual orientation and gender identity or expression and the perception of race, creed, color, sex, physical disability, sexual orientation, gender identity or expression, or national origin as impermissible grounds for discrimination in public lodging establishments and public food service establishments; providing an exception for constitutionally protected free exercise of religion, etc.
Title
Prohibited Discrimination
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] | Sen. Darren Soto [D] | Sen. Larcenia Bullard [D] | Sen. Gwen Margolis [D] |
Sen. Jeff Clemens [D] | Sen. Arthenia Joyner [D] | Sen. Christopher Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0239 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
419 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/348 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0348/BillText/Filed/HTML |