FL S0346 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for records containing certain information pertaining to a buyer or transferee who is not found to be prohibited from receipt or transfer of ammunition; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing for the reversion of specified statutory text if certain conditions are met; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Buyer or Transferee of Ammunition
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S334 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H183 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H181 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H183 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H181 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/346 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/346/BillText/Filed/HTML |