FL S0346 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the imprisonment for longer than a certain time for persons who possess, purchase, or possess with the intent to purchase less than a specified amount of a controlled substance; authorizing a court to impose a sentence other than a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment and mandatory fine for a person convicted of trafficking if the court makes certain findings on the record; requiring that a custodial interrogation conducted at a place of detention in connection with certain offenses be electronically recorded in its entirety; revising the circumstances under which a wrongfully incarcerated person is eligible for compensation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-13SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-12-11SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 12/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-18SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-11-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-11-12SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-09-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H259 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
S468 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H339 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback