FL H0259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends filing deadline for petition claiming wrongful incarceration; provides limited retroactivity for filing petition claiming wrongful incarceration; removes eligibility requirements relating to person's conduct before person's wrongful conviction or incarceration; authorizes state to deduct amount of civil award from compensation amount owed if claimant first receives civil award; requires claimant to reimburse state for any difference between state compensation & civil award if claimant receives statutory compensation prior to civil award; requires claimant to notify DLA upon filing civil action.
Title
Compensation for Wrongful Incarceration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-07 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-06 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/29/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-17 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-15 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-09-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S346 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |