FL S0342 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for information concerning preregistered voter registration applicants who are minors; providing for future legislative review and repeal; providing for retroactive application; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Voters and Voter Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 281
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/HB 281
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-24SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-17SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-02SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-20SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-03-20SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H281 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Chapter No. 2019-55

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
970585Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback