FL H0281 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Chapter No. 2019-55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for information related to a voter registration applicant's or voter's prior felony conviction and his or her restoration of voting rights; providing an exemption from public records requirements for information concerning preregistered voter registration applicants who are minors; providing for future legislative review and repeal; providing for retroactive application; providing statements of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Voters and Voter Registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#375 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#353 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#258 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Chapter No. 2019-55
2019-05-23 Approved by Governor
2019-05-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 106 NAYS 2
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (177606) 1268
2019-05-03HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (425013)
2019-05-03SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (177606)
2019-05-01SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 1
2019-05-01HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (113608) 1128
2019-05-01HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (425013)
2019-04-29HouseIn returning messages
2019-04-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-04-29SenateAmendment(s) adopted (113608)
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26SenateMotion to reconsider adopted
2019-04-26SenateCS failed to pass; YEAS 24 NAYS 16
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for SB 342
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (433455)
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-10HouseCS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-09HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-08HouseCS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall -- Not considered
2019-03-29HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-13HouseNow in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2019-03-13HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S342 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 281

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
970585Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Amendment/223323/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Amendment/433455/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Amendment/548055/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Vote/HouseVote_h00281c1258.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Vote/SenateVote_h00281e1006.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Vote/SenateVote_h00281e1009.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Vote/HouseVote_h00281e1353.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Vote/SenateVote_h00281e1025.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/281/Vote/HouseVote_h00281e1375.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback