FL S0336 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a large-scale agricultural pollution reduction pilot program within the Department of Environmental Protection as a partnership with dairy farms for a specified purpose; specifying that pilot program participants are presumed to comply with water quality standards and are eligible for certain permit terms and funding; authorizing the department to grant general permits for certain department-approved large-scale dairy farm pollution reduction pilot program participants, etc.
Title
Large-scale Agricultural Pollution Reduction Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/15/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Now in Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/27/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1535 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |