FL S0336 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that, upon the request of a member of the Legislature, the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability prepare a racial and ethnic impact statement describing the anticipated effects of proposed legislation or a proposed amendment to the State Constitution on certain minority persons; requiring a ballot to include a racial and ethnic impact statement under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Management Services to create a racial and ethnic impact statement form and distribute it to state agencies, etc.
Title
Impact Statements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-11-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0237 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/336 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0336/BillText/Filed/HTML |