FL S0332 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act"; requiring correctional facilities to provide incarcerated women with certain health care products, subject to certain requirements; providing requirements for male correctional facility employees in certain circumstances; requiring documentation of certain incidents involving male correctional facility employees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incarcerated Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-06SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/06/19, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-02-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H49 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
944242Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback