FL H0049 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates act "Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act"; requires state correctional facilities to provide incarcerated women with certain healthcare products; provides requirements for male correctional employees in certain circumstances; requires documentation of certain incidents involving male correctional employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incarcerated Women

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#291 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#204 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-65
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-29HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-29HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (795286) 1011
2019-04-26HouseIn returning messages
2019-04-26SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (795286)
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 332
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateIn Messages
2019-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-16HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-04-02HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-04-02HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-20HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-11-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H41 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S332 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 49 (Ch. 2019-65)
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1326 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
944242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback